Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Tegrimus Tegrimi

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1567¹BornLucques
23 Sep 163063.7AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
7 Oct 163063.7Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
1 Mar 163871.1AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
Mar 1641³74.1DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tegrimus Tegrimi:
Patriarch Tegrimus Tegrimi , Bishop of Assisi

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 97
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 6 Mar 2015