Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio Tomacelli, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castro di Puglia


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1631AppointedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
18 May 1631Ordained BishopBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
6 Feb 1642DiedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Tomacelli
Bishop Dionisio Tomacelli O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Castro di Puglia

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 139
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 24
  • ob/c2+: AT, 4 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Sep 2016