Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcello Cervini

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano


Events

DateEventTitle
15 May 1645AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
28 May 1645Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
23 Sep 1652AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
8 Feb 1663DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcello Cervini:
Bishop Marcello Cervini (died ) Bishop of Montepulciano

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 323, and Page 248
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 110, Number 668

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013