Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Checconi

Deceased

Bishop of Pienza


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Nov 1665AppointedBishop of Pienza, Italy
22 Nov 1665Ordained BishopBishop of Pienza, Italy
19 Mar 1668DiedBishop of Pienza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Checconi:
Bishop Giovanni Checconi (died ) Bishop of Pienza

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 280
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015