Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeronim de Andreis

Deceased

Bishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1614¹Born
13 Apr 166551.2AppointedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
3 May 166551.3Ordained BishopBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
2 Feb 167359.0DiedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jeronim de Andreis
Bishop Jeronim de Andreis (born 1614, died ) Bishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrau, Diocese of Trogir (Tra¨)
Ordained BishopSant'Ignazio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceTrau, Diocese of Trogir (Tra¨)

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 384
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 170
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1665, Number 30
  • ob/c2+: AT, 4 Jun 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jul 2017