Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Theodoli (Teodolo)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Forli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1594¹Born
7 Apr 162531.0AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
20 Apr 162531.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
7 May 163541.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Forli, Italy
1665²70.7ResignedBishop of Forli, Italy
21 Mar 166773.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Forli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Theodoli (Teodolo)
Archbishop Giacomo Theodoli (Teodolo) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Forli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 189, and Page 80
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 25
  • ob/c2/loc: AT, 15 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 19 Nov 2018

Quantcast