Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Ferrero

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Vitale

Bishop of Perugia


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jan 1504AppointedBishop of Noli, Italy
9 Apr 1504Ordained BishopBishop of Noli, Italy
13 Aug 1504AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
1 Dec 1505Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 1505InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
30 Mar 1506AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
23 Jul 1508DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ferrero
Antonio Cardinal Ferrero (died ) Bishop of Gubbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavona
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
  • a cardinal for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Dec 1505
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 271, and Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1504, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast