Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Gentile Cardinal Pallavicini

Deceased

Bishop of Orense, Spain

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Administrator of Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1441¹Born
15 Jun 148443.4AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
27 Jan 148645.0AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
5 Mar 148746.1ResignedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
Mar 1489³48.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
9 Mar 148948.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 148948.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
19 Aug 149150.6AppointedAdministrator of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
26 Mar 149251.2AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
31 Aug 149251.6AppointedAdministrator of Pamplona, Spain
20 Mar 149352.2ResignedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
20 Sep 149352.7ResignedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
21 Mar 149453.2AppointedAdministrator of Lectoure, France
21 May 149453.3ResignedAdministrator of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
Jun 1498³57.4ResignedAdministrator of Lectoure, France
10 Apr 150362.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
22 Dec 150362.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
1 Jul 150463.5ResignedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
10 Sep 150766.6DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Gentile Pallavicini (VIAF: 80626083)
Antonio Gentile Cardinal Pallavicini (born 1441, died ) Bishop of Orense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova
Buried Place (Original)San Pietro, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)S. Maria del Popolo, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 18.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Mar 1489
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 268, and Page 171
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 99
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1484, Number 32*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Dec 2018

Quantcast