Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardino Cardinal López de Carvajal y Sande

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1456BornPlasencia
27 Aug 148832.0AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
21 Dec 148832.3Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
23 Jan 148932.4AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
27 Mar 149336.6AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
20 Sep 149337.0Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 149337.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
2 Feb 149538.4AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
2 Feb 149538.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
28 Jul 150346.9AppointedAdministrator of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
30 Dec 150347.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
1505¹48.3ResignedAdministrator of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
3 Aug 150750.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
17 Sep 150751.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
10 Jan 150851.3AppointedAdministrator of Rossano, Italy
22 Sep 150852.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
28 Mar 150952.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
24 Oct 151155.1ResignedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
24 Oct 151155.1ResignedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
24 Oct 151155.1ResignedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
27 Jun 151356.8AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
27 Jun 151356.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
27 Jun 151356.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
151962.3ResignedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
20 Jun 151962.8ResignedAdministrator of Rossano, Italy
14 Jan 152164.3AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
24 Jul 152164.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
20 Feb 152366.4ResignedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
16 Dec 152367.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino López de Carvajal y Sande:
Cardinal Bernardino López de Carvajal y Sande (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 35.0 years
  • a cardinal for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1493
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 126, and Page 210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013