Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ardicino Cardinal della Porta (Jr.)

Deceased

Bishop of Aleria

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Administrator of Olomouc (Olmütz)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1434¹BornNovara
22 Feb 147541.1AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
9 Mar 148955.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 148955.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
3 Jun 148955.4AppointedAdministrator of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
4 Feb 149359.0DiedBishop of Aleria, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ardicino della Porta (Jr.) (VIAF: 45370857)
Ardicino Cardinal della Porta (Jr.) (born 1434, died ) Bishop of Aleria

  • a cardinal for 3.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Mar 1489

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Aug 2016