Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Cibo de’ Mari

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Administrator of Noli

Administrator of Vannes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450¹Born
5 Dec 148535.9AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
28 Mar 148636.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
9 Mar 148939.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 148939.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
29 Aug 149040.6AppointedAdministrator of Vannes, France
14 Mar 149141.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
9 Dec 149747.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
Sep 1500³50.6ResignedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
14 May 150151.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
Jan 1503³53.0AppointedAdministrator of Noli, Italy
20 Jan 150353.0ResignedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
29 Nov 150353.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
21 Dec 150353.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Cibo de’ Mari (VIAF: 30604390)
Lorenzo Cardinal Cibo de’ Mari (born 1450, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento

EventPlace
Ordained BishopVatican, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Lorenzo Chapel, S. Maria del Popolo, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
  • a cardinal for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Mar 1489
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 104, and Page 200
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 264
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1486, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 26 Dec 2018

Quantcast