Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Niccol˛ Bucciardi Cybo

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles, France


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Oct 1485AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
28 Mar 1486Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
24 Apr 1489AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
Jul 1499²DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Bucciardi Cybo
Archbishop Niccol˛ Bucciardi Cybo (died Jul 1499) Archbishop of Arles

EventPlace
Ordained BishopVatican, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 142, and Page 93
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,486, Number 1
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Mar 1489

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast