Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Ducco

Deceased

Bishop of Coron (Coronea), Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jun 1479AppointedBishop of Coron (Coronea), Greece
5 Sep 1479Ordained BishopBishop of Coron (Coronea), Greece
21 Jan 1496DiedBishop of Coron (Coronea), Greece

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ducco
Bishop Giovanni Ducco (died ) Bishop of Coron (Coronea)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Via Lata, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 138
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Number 18,207
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1479, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast