Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Galeotto Cardinal Franciotti della Rovere

Deceased

Bishop of Lucca, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

Administrator of Benevento

Administrator of Vicenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1471Born
Oct 1503²32.7AppointedBishop of Lucca, Italy
29 Nov 150332.9Elevated to Cardinal
6 Dec 150332.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
9 Apr 150433.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lucca, Italy
30 Aug 150433.6AppointedAdministrator of Benevento, Italy
27 May 150534.4AppointedAdministrator of Cremona, Italy
150736.0ResignedAdministrator of Cremona, Italy
Aug 1507³36.5AppointedAdministrator of Vicenza, Italy
11 Sep 150736.6DiedBishop of Lucca, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Galeotto Franciotti della Rovere (VIAF: 254972201)
Galeotto Cardinal Franciotti della Rovere (born 1471, died ) Bishop of Lucca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucca
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
  • a cardinal for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1503
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 333, and Page 228
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,504, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast