Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gabriele Cardinal de’ Gabrielli

Deceased

Bishop of Urbino

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1445BornFano
27 Mar 150459.2AppointedBishop of Urbino, Italy
9 Apr 150459.3Ordained BishopBishop of Urbino, Italy
1 Dec 150560.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 150561.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
11 Sep 150762.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
5 Nov 151166.8DiedBishop of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gabriele de’ Gabrielli:
Cardinal Gabriele de’ Gabrielli (died ) Bishop of Urbino

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
  • a cardinal for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Dec 1505
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013