Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcantonio Oradino

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mantova, Italy

Titular Bishop of Utica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1518¹Born
26 Oct 156547.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mantova, Italy
26 Oct 156547.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
16 Dec 156547.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
6 Oct 156648.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mantova, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Oradino
Bishop Marcantonio Oradino (born 1518, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia, Diocese of Perugia
Ordained BishopVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceMantova, Diocese of Mantova

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 324
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,565, Number 30*
  • ob/c2+/d: AT, 12 Jun 2019
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Number 20,133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast