Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Delfino

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1529BornVenezia
3 Jan 156333.5AppointedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
29 May 157141.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
Dec 1577³48.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
26 Aug 157950.2AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
1 May 158454.9DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Delfino (VIAF: 45093825)
Bishop Giovanni Delfino (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 315
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016