Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Sperandio Corbelli

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Apr 1567AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
11 May 1567Ordained BishopBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
10 Mar 1574ResignedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
29 May 1581AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
1590¹DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Sperandio Corbelli
Bishop Tommaso Sperandio Corbelli (died 1590) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceBagnorea, Diocese of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 128, and Page 316
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 11, Number 26
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1567, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018