Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Diedo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crema, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1522¹Born
21 Nov 158058.8AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
9 Apr 158159.2Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
19 May 158159.3InstalledBishop of Crema, Italy
28 May 158462.4ResignedBishop of Crema, Italy
10 Jun 158563.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Crema, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Girolamo Diedo
Bishop Girolamo Diedo
(born 1522, died )
Bishop Emeritus of Crema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSanta Caterina, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Original)Santa Caterina, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 181
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1580, Number 22*
  • ob/c2+/loc/b: AT, 16 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.2, 10 May 2025; Data: 17 May 2025