Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Guglielmi (Vielmi), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1519¹Born
17 Mar 156344.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
17 Mar 156344.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Argos
19 Jul 157051.5AppointedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
7 Mar 158263.1DiedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Girolamo Guglielmi (Vielmi)
Bishop Girolamo Guglielmi (Vielmi) O.P.
(born 1519, died )
Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova)

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 117, and Page 96
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1563, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.2, 10 May 2025; Data: 17 May 2025