Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Cauco (Cocco)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Corf¨, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1532Born
29 May 156028.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Corf¨, Greece
29 May 156028.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
1565¹32.8SucceededArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
1577¹44.8ResignedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
10 Mar 1583³51.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Corf¨, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Cauco (Cocco)
Archbishop Antonio Cauco (Cocco) (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Corf¨

EventPlace
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 178, and Page 271
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,560, Number 36*
  • bd/d: AT, 12 Jun 2019
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast