Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitale Giuseppe de’ Buoi

Deceased

Bishop of Perugia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1656BornBologna
4 Dec 167822.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 May 168023.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 171154.2AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
24 Feb 171154.2Ordained BishopBishop of Perugia, Italy
23 Nov 172669.9DiedBishop of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vitale Giuseppe de’ Buoi:
Bishop Vitale Giuseppe de’ Buoi (born , died ) Bishop of Perugia

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 311
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015