Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal López

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

Administrator of Carcassonne

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1455¹BornValencia, Spain
29 Dec 149237.9AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
19 Feb 149641.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Feb 149641.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
17 Apr 149742.2AppointedAdministrator of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
23 Dec 149742.9AppointedAdministrator of Carcassonne, France
28 May 149843.4ResignedAdministrator of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
15 Oct 149843.7AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
10 May 150146.3AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
5 Aug 150146.5DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan López:
Juan Cardinal López (died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a cardinal for 5.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1496
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015