Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Vianello

Deceased

Archbishop of Perugia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1887BornVenezia
25 Jul 191123.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 193143.5AppointedBishop of Fidenza, Italy
10 May 193143.7Ordained BishopBishop of Fidenza, Italy
7 Jun 193143.8InstalledBishop of Fidenza, Italy
11 Mar 194355.5AppointedArchbishop of Perugia, Italy
13 Aug 195567.9DiedArchbishop of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Vianello:
Archbishop Mario Vianello (born , died ) Archbishop of Perugia

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013