Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Giberti

Deceased

Bishop of Fidenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1890Born
7 Apr 191322.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 194352.7AppointedBishop of Fidenza, Italy
20 Jun 194352.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fidenza, Italy
19 Feb 195261.4DiedBishop of Fidenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Giberti
Bishop Francesco Giberti (born , died ) Bishop of Fidenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018