Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio (Pellegrino) Danti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1536Born
7 Mar 155518.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Nov 158347.6AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
30 Nov 158347.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
10 Oct 158650.5DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ignazio (Pellegrino) Danti (VIAF: 247578)
Bishop Ignazio (Pellegrino) Danti O.P. (born Apr 1536, died ) Bishop of Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia, Diocese of Perugia
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 99
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 22, Number 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1583, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast