Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Pedoca Mirandulano, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lacedonia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1584AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
6 May 1584Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
27 Jan 1602DiedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Pedoca Mirandulano
Bishop Marco Pedoca Mirandulano O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Lacedonia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Paul hors les murs, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 219
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 22, Number 94
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018