Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Cornaro (Sr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1478BornVenice
20 Dec 152749.9Elevated to Cardinal
27 Apr 152850.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
153052.0AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
Mar 153153.1AppointedAdministrator of Brescia, Italy
21 Dec 153153.9Ordained BishopAdministrator of Brescia, Italy
13 Mar 153254.1ResignedAdministrator of Brescia, Italy
27 Apr 153456.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
5 Sep 153456.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
31 May 153557.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
23 Mar 154163.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
14 Nov 154163.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
15 Feb 154264.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
26 Sep 154365.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cornaro (Sr.):
Francesco Cardinal Cornaro (Sr.) (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
  • a cardinal for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1527

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015