Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andrea Cardinal Cornaro

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1511Born
13 Mar 153220.2AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
19 Dec 154433.0Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 154533.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro
27 Jun 155038.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
30 Jan 155139.1DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Cornaro (VIAF: 316740278)
Andrea Cardinal Cornaro (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice

  • a cardinal for 6.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1544
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018