Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Cancellotti, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1604Born
1 Apr 165854.0AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
7 Apr 165854.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
26 Jun 166258.2AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
27 Jun 167369.2DiedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Cancellotti
Bishop Cesare Cancellotti C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Severino

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 120, Number 732
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 369, and Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast