Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Bovi

Deceased

Bishop of Sarsina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1576¹Born
Jan 1622³46.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Jan 162246.0AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
30 Jan 162246.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
29 Jan 163559.0AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
24 Mar 164670.2DiedBishop of Sarsina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Bovi
Bishop Carlo Bovi (born 1576, died ) Bishop of Sarsina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologne

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 108, and Page 306
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 74, Number 435
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018