Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ottaviano Garzadori

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1567¹Born
19 Dec 162255.9AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
22 Jan 162356.0Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
11 Mar 162457.1AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
Jan 1639³72.0ResignedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottaviano Garzadori
Archbishop Ottaviano Garzadori (born 1567) Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicenza, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 117, and Page 207
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast