Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Johann von Vogt von Altensumerau und Prasberg

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1611BornAchberg
3 Mar 163523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
16 Dec 164130.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
16 Dec 164130.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Megara
22 Dec 164130.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Megara
16 Feb 164533.3SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
28 May 164533.6ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
7 Mar 168977.3DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Johann von Vogt von Altensumerau und Prasberg:
Bishop Franz Johann von Vogt von Altensumerau und Prasberg (born , died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 47.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 237, and Page 161
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 106, Number 642

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013