Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovicus Galbiati

Deceased

Bishop of Acerno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577¹BornRoma
17 Aug 163760.6AppointedBishop of Acerno, Italy
6 Sep 163760.6Ordained BishopBishop of Acerno, Italy
23 May 163861.3DiedBishop of Acerno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovicus Galbiati:
Bishop Ludovicus Galbiati (born 1577, died ) Bishop of Acerno

  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 66
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 99, Number 597
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015