Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Władysław Wierusz Walknowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

Titular Bishop of Benda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1714³BornLaszczyn
6 Jan 174025.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Poznań, Poland
2 Feb 174025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
19 Dec 176854.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
19 Dec 176854.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
26 Feb 176954.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benda
Dec 1779³65.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Władysław Wierusz Walknowski:
Bishop Władysław Wierusz Walknowski (born , died Dec 1779) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 120, and Page 454
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Dec 2015