Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Theophilus Howaniec, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santissima Trinitą in Almaty, Kazakhstan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1931Born
14 Jun 195625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
7 Jul 199968.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Almaty, Kazakhstan
14 Oct 200069.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Acholla
26 Nov 200069.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acholla
17 May 200372.2AppointedBishop of Santissima Trinitą in Almaty, Kazakhstan
5 Mar 201180.0RetiredBishop of Santissima Trinitą in Almaty, Kazakhstan
30 Mar 201887.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Santissima Trinitą in Almaty, Kazakhstan

MicroData Summary for Henry Theophilus Howaniec (VIAF: 262348682)
Bishop Henry Theophilus Howaniec O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santissima Trinitą in Almaty

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA
Death PlaceMilwaukee, WI, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
Buried Place (Original)Provincial, Cemetery, Pulaski, WI, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,862

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast