Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amédée Wilfrid Proulx

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Portland, Maine

Titular Bishop of Clypia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1932BornSanford
31 May 195825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Portland, Maine, USA
16 Sep 197543.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portland, Maine, USA
16 Sep 197543.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Clypia
12 Nov 197543.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clypia
22 Nov 199361.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Portland, Maine, USA

MicroData Summary for Amédée Wilfrid Proulx:
Bishop Amédée Wilfrid Proulx (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Portland

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015