Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Francis Vasa

Bishop of Santa Rosa in California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1951 BornLincoln
22 May 197625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
19 Nov 199948.5AppointedBishop of Baker, Oregon, USA
26 Jan 200048.7Ordained BishopBishop of Baker, Oregon, USA
24 Jan 201159.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Santa Rosa in California, USA
6 Mar 201159.8InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Santa Rosa in California, USA
30 Jun 201160.1SucceededBishop of Santa Rosa in California, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Francis Vasa:
Bishop Robert Francis Vasa (born ) Bishop of Santa Rosa in California

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Rosa in California.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2011
  • s: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,688

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013