Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabian Wendelin Bruskewitz

Bishop Emeritus of Lincoln, Nebraska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1935 BornMilwaukee
8 May 196024.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
17 Jul 196024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
24 Mar 199256.5AppointedBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
13 May 199256.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
14 Sep 201277.0RetiredBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for Fabian Wendelin Bruskewitz:
Bishop Fabian Wendelin Bruskewitz (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lincoln

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lincoln.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,679
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013