Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Thaddeus Joseph Butler

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Concordia, Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1833Born
1855¹21.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
5 Jul 189763.6AppointedBishop of Concordia, Kansas, USA
16 Jul 189763.7DiedBishop-Elect of Concordia, Kansas, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thaddeus Joseph Butler (VIAF: 88729099)
Father Thaddeus Joseph Butler (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Concordia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick, Diocese of Limerick, Ireland
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 42.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 222
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast