Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony O’Regan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois

Titular Bishop of Dora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1809BornLavalleyroe, Ireland
29 Nov 183425.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 185344.4AppointedBishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
16 Dec 185344.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Quincy, Illinois, USA
25 Jul 185445.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
3 Sep 185445.1InstalledBishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
9 Jan 185747.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Quincy, Illinois, USA
2 May 185848.8ResignedBishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
6 Jul 185848.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
13 Nov 186657.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Anthony O’Regan:
Bishop Anthony O’Regan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chicago

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 200, and Page 250
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 474

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013