Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Duggan

Deceased

Bishop of Chicago, Illinois

Note/Previous Titular See: Antigone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1825BornMaynooth, Ireland
29 May 184722.0Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
9 Jan 185731.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
9 Jan 185731.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gabala
3 May 185731.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gabala
21 Jan 185933.7AppointedBishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
10 Sep 188055.3ResignedBishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
27 Mar 189973.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for James Duggan:
Bishop James Duggan (born , died ) Bishop of Chicago

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 200, and Page 279
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 352

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013