Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Joseph Foys

Bishop Emeritus of Covington, Kentucky, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1945 Born
16 May 197327.8Ordained PriestPriest of Steubenville, Ohio, USA
31 May 200256.8AppointedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
15 Jul 200256.9Ordained BishopBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
13 Jul 202175.9RetiredBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Roger Joseph Foys
Bishop Roger Joseph Foys (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Covington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral Basilica, Covington, Diocese of Covington, Kentucky

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Covington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,226
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Jul 2021

Quantcast