Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Curtis Iffert

Bishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1967 Born
7 Jun 199729.5Ordained PriestPriest of Belleville, Illinois, USA
Aug 2003³35.6EnteredPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2004²36.1Simple VowsPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2008²40.1CeasedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Jul 202153.6AppointedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
30 Sep 202153.8Ordained BishopBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Curtis Iffert
Bishop John Curtis Iffert (born ) Bishop of Covington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDu Quoin, Diocese of Belleville, Illinois
Ordained PriestSacred Heart, Church, Du Quoin, Diocese of Belleville, Illinois
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral Basilica, Covington, Diocese of Covington, Kentucky

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Covington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2021
  • mn/ob: CB, 13 Jul 2021
  • c2+: CB, 3 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Sep 2021

Quantcast