Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerome Aloysius Daugherty Sebastian

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland

Titular Bishop of Baris in Hellesponto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1895BornWashington, DC
25 May 192226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
22 Dec 195358.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
22 Dec 195358.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Baris in Hellesponto
24 Feb 195458.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baris in Hellesponto
11 Oct 196064.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for Jerome Aloysius Daugherty Sebastian:
Bishop Jerome Aloysius Daugherty Sebastian (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Baltimore

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013