Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Mark Stanislaus Gross

Deceased

Priest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1843Born
30 Jun 186824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
24 Feb 188036.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of North Carolina, USA
24 Feb 188036.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lyrbe
1881¹37.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of North Carolina, USA
1881¹37.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Lyrbe
1 Dec 189653.2DiedPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mark Stanislaus Gross
Father Mark Stanislaus Gross (born , died ) Priest of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained PriestCathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Death PlaceWashington, D.C.

  • a priest for 28.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 356
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017