Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Joseph Furlong

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

Titular Bishop of Araxa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1892BornNew York, NY
18 May 191825.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 195563.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
3 Dec 195563.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Araxa
25 Jan 195663.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Araxa
197178.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
13 Apr 198996.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

MicroData Summary for Philip Joseph Furlong:
Bishop Philip Joseph Furlong (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

  • a priest for 70.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013