Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Walter Arthur Coggin, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1916BornRichmond
2 Jul 193721.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Jun 194327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Nov 195943.7SelectedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
28 Mar 196044.1ConfirmedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
11 Feb 197054.0ResignedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
28 Dec 199983.8DiedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict

MicroData Summary for Walter Arthur Coggin (VIAF: 88642604)
Abbot Walter Arthur Coggin O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians

  • a priest for 56.5 years

Source(s):
  • r: CB, 17 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Nov 2016