Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John James Jonckau

Deceased

Priest of Vancouver Island, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1840Born
Aug 186727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Vancouver Island, USA
17 Apr 188342.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vancouver Island, USA
17 Apr 188342.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cucusus
Dec 1883²43.3ResignedCoadjutor Bishop-Elect of Vancouver Island, USA
Dec 1883²43.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
29 Jul 188847.9DiedPriest of Vancouver Island, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John James Jonckau
Father John James Jonckau (born Aug 1840, died ) Priest of Vancouver Island

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelgium

  • a priest for 20.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 232
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017