Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Remi Joseph De Roo

Bishop Emeritus of Victoria, British Columbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1924 BornSwan Lake
8 Jun 195026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
29 Oct 196238.6AppointedBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
14 Dec 196238.8Ordained BishopBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
18 Mar 199975.0RetiredBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Remi Joseph De Roo:
Bishop Remi Joseph De Roo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Victoria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Victoria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015